EP0347760 - Use of aqueous polymer dispersions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/52] | Aqueous polymer dispersions | ||
[1993/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.1994 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RWE-DEA Aktiengesellschaft für Mineraloel und Chemie Postfach 60 04 49 22204 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/23] | For all designated states RWE-DEA Aktiengesellschaft für Mineraloel und Chemie Postfach 60 04 49 D-22204 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1989/52] | For all designated states DEUTSCHE TEXACO AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Überseering 40 D-2000 Hamburg 60 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zeibig, Winfried, Dr. Oberwallstrasse 4 D-4130 Moers 1 / DE | 02 /
Hüskes, Heinrich Oedinger Platz 1a D-4150 Krefeld 29 / DE | 03 /
Laping, Karl-Heinz, Dr. Wehmstrasse 5 D-4130 Moers 2 / DE | 04 /
Hausmann, Paul-Gerhard Ruhrorterstrasse 28 D-4100 Duisburg 17 / DE | [1989/52] | Representative(s) | Schupfner, Gerhard D. Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Parkstrasse 1 21244 Buchholz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/52] | Schupfner, Gerhard D. Patentanwälte Müller, Schupfner & Gauger Postfach 17 53 D-21236 Buchholz / DE | Application number, filing date | 89110916.7 | 16.06.1989 | [1989/52] | Priority number, date | DE19883820754 | 18.06.1988 Original published format: DE 3820754 | [1989/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0347760 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0347760 | Date: | 29.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C09D7/12, C08K5/42, C08F2/26 | [1989/52] | CPC: |
C08F2/26 (EP);
C09D5/02 (EP,US);
C08K5/42 (EP);
C09D5/027 (EP);
C09K23/00 (EP);
C09K23/10 (EP,US);
C09K23/22 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/52] | Title | German: | Verwendung von wässrigen Kunststoffdispersionen | [1993/39] | English: | Use of aqueous polymer dispersions | [1993/39] | French: | Utilisation des dispersions aqueuses de polymères | [1993/39] |
Former [1989/52] | Wässrige Kunststoffdispersionen | ||
Former [1989/52] | Aqueous polymer dispersions | ||
Former [1989/52] | Dispersions aqueuses de polymères | Examination procedure | 17.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/24] | 27.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 29.09.1993 | GB | 29.09.1993 | IT | 29.09.1993 | SE | 29.09.1993 | [2008/01] |
Former [2002/24] | ES | 29.09.1993 | |
GB | 29.09.1993 | ||
IT | 29.09.1993 | ||
SE | 29.09.1993 | ||
Former [1999/42] | GB | 29.09.1993 | |
IT | 29.09.1993 | ||
SE | 29.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/41] | GB | 29.09.1993 | |
SE | 29.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/26] | SE | 29.09.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1804159 (ROEHM & HAAS GMBH) |