EP0347817 - Pneumatic tire [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.12.1994 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.02.1995 [1995/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO., LTD. 36-11, Shinbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-0004 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | For all designated states THE YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO., LTD. 36-11, Shinbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105 / JP | ||
Former [1989/52] | For all designated states THE YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO., LTD. 36-11, Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hisamichi, Masaki 206-4-6, Yanagishima 1-chome Chigasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Hazama, Hirohisa 490-1034, Tokunobu Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Tsukada, Shuichi 4-50, Tanjogaoka Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1989/52] | Representative(s) | Weber, Dieter, et al Weber, Seiffert, Lieke Postfach 61 45 65051 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/52] | Weber, Dieter, Dr., et al Weber, Dieter, Dr., Seiffert, Klaus, Dipl.-Phys., Lieke, Winfried, Dr. Postfach 61 45 D-65051 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 89111149.4 | 20.06.1989 | [1989/52] | Priority number, date | JP19880152167 | 22.06.1988 Original published format: JP 15216788 | JP19880250838 | 06.10.1988 Original published format: JP 25083888 | [1989/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0347817 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0347817 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0347817 | Date: | 09.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B60C11/11 | [1989/52] | CPC: |
B60C11/0304 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/52] | Title | German: | Luftreifen | [1989/52] | English: | Pneumatic tire | [1989/52] | French: | Bandage pneumatique | [1989/52] | Examination procedure | 07.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/32] | 31.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP6175003 ; | [X]US4730654 (YAMASHITA TAKASHI [JP], et al); | [A]GB1514473 (MICHELIN & CIE); | [A]DE3612886 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD [JP]); | [A]FR2452391 (KLEBER COLOMBES) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 246 (M-510)[2302], 23rd August 1986; & JP-A-61 75 003 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND. LTD) 17-04-1986, & JP6175003 A 00000000 |