EP0347939 - Method for preparing alpha-(4-isobutylphenyl) propionic acid or its precursor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.1994 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.08.1994 [1994/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON PETROCHEMICALS CO., LTD. 3-1, Uchisaiwai-cho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [1989/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimizu, Isoo 2-3-5, Nagahama Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Matsumura, Yasuo 3-35-1, Ohkubo Kohnan-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Tokumoto, Yuuichi 3-35-1, Ohkubo Kohnan-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Uchida, Kazumichi 8-11, Isogo Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1989/52] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/52] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89111484.5 | 23.06.1989 | [1989/52] | Priority number, date | JP19880156331 | 24.06.1988 Original published format: JP 15633188 | JP19880156332 | 24.06.1988 Original published format: JP 15633288 | JP19880314152 | 13.12.1988 Original published format: JP 31415288 | JP19880314155 | 13.12.1988 Original published format: JP 31415588 | [1989/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0347939 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0347939 | Date: | 25.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07C57/30, C07C51/00, C07C47/453, C07C45/00, C07C15/02 | [1989/52] | CPC: |
C07C2/66 (EP,US);
C07C2/72 (EP,US);
C07C45/50 (EP,US);
C07C5/3335 (EP,US);
C07C51/14 (EP,US);
C07C51/235 (EP,US);
C07C6/123 (EP,US);
C07C2521/12 (EP,US);
C07C2523/04 (EP,US);
C07C2523/745 (EP,US);
C07C2523/86 (EP,US);
C07C2527/1206 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C2/66, C07C15/02 (US,EP);
C07C2/72, C07C15/02 (US,EP);
C07C45/50, C07C47/228 (EP,US);
C07C5/3335, C07C15/44 (US,EP);
C07C51/14, C07C57/30 (EP,US);
C07C51/235, C07C57/30 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1989/52] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von alpha-(4-Isobutyl)propionsäure oder ihres Vorläufers | [1989/52] | English: | Method for preparing alpha-(4-isobutylphenyl) propionic acid or its precursor | [1989/52] | French: | Méthode de préparation de l'acide alpha-(4-isobutylphényl)propionique ou son précurseur | [1989/52] | Examination procedure | 21.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/33] | 21.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.11.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0170147 (NIPPON PETROCHEMICALS CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0226566 (MONSANTO CO [US]); | [A]DE2646792 (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO); | [A]US2864859 (ABRAHAM SCHNEIDER) |