EP0349871 - Cutting plate for a machining operation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.1993 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.04.1993 [1993/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CERASIV GmbH INNOVATIVES KERAMIK-ENGINEERING Fabrikstrasse 23-29 D-73207 Plochingen / DE | [1992/38] |
Former [1992/16] | For all designated states Stora Feldmühle Aktiengesellschaft Feldmühleplatz 1 D-40545 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1990/02] | For all designated states Feldmühle Aktiengesellschaft Fritz-Vomfelde-Platz 4 D-40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roos, Erwin Wilhelmstrasse 18 D-7310 Plochingen / DE | [1990/02] | Application number, filing date | 89111568.5 | 24.06.1989 | [1990/02] | Priority number, date | DE19883823199 | 08.07.1988 Original published format: DE 3823199 | [1990/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0349871 | Date: | 10.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0349871 | Date: | 06.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B23B27/16 | [1990/02] | CPC: |
B23B27/145 (EP,US);
B23B2200/083 (EP,US);
B23B2200/085 (EP,US);
B23B2200/201 (EP,US);
B23B2200/242 (EP,US);
Y10T407/23 (EP,US);
Y10T407/28 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/02] | Title | German: | Schneidplatte für spanabhebende Bearbeitung | [1990/02] | English: | Cutting plate for a machining operation | [1990/02] | French: | Plaquette de coupe pour usinage de métaux | [1990/02] | Examination procedure | 10.07.1989 | Examination requested [1990/02] | 25.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1578729 (LUCAS INDUSTRIES LTD); | [A]GB2054418 (FELDMUEHLE AG); | [A]US4552491 (PARKER FREDERICK D [US]); | [A]US4681488 (MARKUSSON LARS O [SE]) |