EP0348874 - Squared container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EDELHOFF POLYTECHNIK GMBH & CO. Heckenkamp 31 D-58640 Iserlohn / DE | [1990/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Edelhoff, Gustav Dieter Langerfeldstrasse 57 D-5860 Iserlohn / DE | [1990/01] | Representative(s) | Gossel, Hans K., et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/45] | Gossel, Hans K., Dipl.-Ing., et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/01] | Gossel, Hans K., Dipl.-Ing. Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89111625.3 | 26.06.1989 | [1990/01] | Priority number, date | DE19880008225U | 27.06.1988 Original published format: DE 8808225 U | DE19880009465U | 25.07.1988 Original published format: DE 8809465 U | DE19883825184 | 25.07.1988 Original published format: DE 3825184 | [1990/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0348874 | Date: | 03.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0348874 | Date: | 05.05.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | E05D15/46 | [1990/01] | CPC: |
B65F3/143 (EP,US);
E05D15/46 (EP,US);
B65F2003/008 (EP,US);
E05Y2999/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/01] | Title | German: | Quaderförmiger Container | [1990/01] | English: | Squared container | [1990/01] | French: | Conteneur carré | [1990/01] | Examination procedure | 24.10.1989 | Examination requested [1990/01] | 10.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.11.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 05.05.1993 | ES | 05.05.1993 | FR | 05.05.1993 | GB | 05.05.1993 | GR | 05.05.1993 | IT | 05.05.1993 | NL | 05.05.1993 | SE | 05.05.1993 | AT | 26.06.1993 | CH | 30.06.1993 | LI | 30.06.1993 | LU | 30.06.1993 | [2004/35] |
Former [2002/24] | BE | 05.05.1993 | |
ES | 05.05.1993 | ||
GB | 05.05.1993 | ||
GR | 05.05.1993 | ||
IT | 05.05.1993 | ||
NL | 05.05.1993 | ||
SE | 05.05.1993 | ||
AT | 26.06.1993 | ||
CH | 30.06.1993 | ||
LI | 30.06.1993 | ||
LU | 30.06.1993 | ||
FR | 24.09.1993 | ||
Former [2000/04] | BE | 05.05.1993 | |
GB | 05.05.1993 | ||
GR | 05.05.1993 | ||
IT | 05.05.1993 | ||
NL | 05.05.1993 | ||
SE | 05.05.1993 | ||
AT | 26.06.1993 | ||
CH | 30.06.1993 | ||
LI | 30.06.1993 | ||
LU | 30.06.1993 | ||
FR | 24.09.1993 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 05.05.1993 | |
GB | 05.05.1993 | ||
IT | 05.05.1993 | ||
NL | 05.05.1993 | ||
SE | 05.05.1993 | ||
AT | 26.06.1993 | ||
CH | 30.06.1993 | ||
LI | 30.06.1993 | ||
FR | 24.09.1993 | ||
Former [1995/02] | BE | 05.05.1993 | |
GB | 05.05.1993 | ||
NL | 05.05.1993 | ||
SE | 05.05.1993 | ||
AT | 26.06.1993 | ||
CH | 30.06.1993 | ||
LI | 30.06.1993 | ||
FR | 24.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/24] | BE | 05.05.1993 | |
GB | 05.05.1993 | ||
NL | 05.05.1993 | ||
SE | 05.05.1993 | ||
CH | 30.06.1993 | ||
LI | 30.06.1993 | ||
FR | 24.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/22] | BE | 05.05.1993 | |
GB | 05.05.1993 | ||
NL | 05.05.1993 | ||
SE | 05.05.1993 | ||
CH | 30.06.1993 | ||
LI | 30.06.1993 | ||
Former [1994/18] | BE | 05.05.1993 | |
NL | 05.05.1993 | ||
SE | 05.05.1993 | ||
CH | 30.06.1993 | ||
LI | 30.06.1993 | ||
Former [1994/09] | BE | 05.05.1993 | |
NL | 05.05.1993 | ||
SE | 05.05.1993 | ||
Former [1994/02] | NL | 05.05.1993 | |
SE | 05.05.1993 | ||
Former [1993/52] | NL | 05.05.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR247240 ; | [A]FR1308150 (MENUISERIE METALLIQUE MODERNE); | [A]DE8800293U |