EP0348960 - Thermally shaped tray with a zip-fastener [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.1993 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZIP-PAK INCORPORATED P.O. Box 4560 Northbrook Illinois 60065 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/01] | For all designated states ZIP-PAK INCORPORATED P.O. Box 4560 Northbrook Illinois 60065 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boeckmann, Hugo 1318 South Walnut Arlington Heights, Illinois 60005 / US | 02 /
Ausnit, Steven 124 East 61 Street New York, New York 10021 / US | [1990/01] | Representative(s) | Mey, Klaus-Peter, et al Patentanwalt Aachener Strasse 710 D-50226 Frechen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/52] | Mey, Klaus-Peter, Dr.-Ing. Dipl.-Wirtsch.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt Aachener Strasse 710 D-50226 Frechen / DE | ||
Former [1990/01] | Mey, Klaus-Peter, Dr.-Ing. Dipl.-Wirt.-Ing. Patentanwalt Dr. Mey Aachener Strasse 710 D-50226 Frechen / DE | Application number, filing date | 89111816.8 | 29.06.1989 | [1990/01] | Priority number, date | US19880213161 | 29.06.1988 Original published format: US 213161 | [1990/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0348960 | Date: | 03.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0348960 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B65D77/30 | [1990/01] | CPC: |
B65B61/188 (EP,US);
B65D77/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/01] | Title | German: | Thermo-Formschalen-System mit Reissverschluss | [1990/01] | English: | Thermally shaped tray with a zip-fastener | [1990/01] | French: | Barquetter thermoformées avec opercules arrachables | [1990/01] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 14.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/06] | 03.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 13.05.1992 | IT | 13.05.1992 | FR | 02.10.1992 | [1999/42] |
Former [1993/46] | GB | 13.05.1992 | |
FR | 02.10.1992 | ||
Former [1993/21] | FR | 02.10.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2147951 (REYNOLDS ALUMINIUMWERKE GMBH); | [Y]FR2546481 (FLEXICO FRANCE SARL [FR]); | [Y]GB1010738 (FLEXIGRIP LTD); | [AP]FR2618411 (VALOINE SARL CHARCUTERIE [FR]) |