EP0350722 - Device for the electrothermal atomisation of a sample for spectroscopical purposes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.1997 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.08.1997 [1997/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BODENSEEWERK PERKIN-ELMER GMBH Askaniaweg 4 D-88662 Überlingen / DE | [1994/24] |
Former [1990/03] | For all designated states Bodenseewerk Perkin-Elmer & Co. GmbH Alte Nussdorfer Strasse 15 Postfach 1120 D-88662 Überlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huber, Bernhard Hildegardring 42 D-7770 Überlingen / DE | 02 /
Tamm, Rolf Am Fohrenbühl 8 D-7777 Salem 2 / DE | 03 /
Stengele, Erich Dorfstrasse 23 D-7776 Taisersdorf / DE | 04 /
Rödel, Günther Hinter den Gärten 13 D-7776 Owingen / DE | [1990/03] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/01] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/03] | Weisse, Jürgen, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt Fuggerstrasse 26 D-10777 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 89111843.2 | 29.06.1989 | [1990/03] | Priority number, date | DE19883823733 | 13.07.1988 Original published format: DE 3823733 | [1990/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0350722 | Date: | 17.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0350722 | Date: | 16.01.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0350722 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/74 | [1990/03] | CPC: |
G01N21/74 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1990/03] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur elektrothermischen Atomisierung einer Probe für spektroskopische Zwecke | [1990/03] | English: | Device for the electrothermal atomisation of a sample for spectroscopical purposes | [1990/03] | French: | Dispositif pour l'atomisation électrothermale d'un échantillon à des fins spectroscopiques | [1990/03] | Examination procedure | 26.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/17] | 27.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 13.07.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/35] | Request for further processing for: | 22.09.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 22.09.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.10.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP61026843 ; | [A]JP52010797 ; | [A]JP54162596 ; | [AD]US4022530 (BRAUN KLAUS, et al); | [AD]GB2102589 (VARIAN TECHTRON PTY LTD [AU]); | [AD]DD203391 (HUETTIG WERNER); | [A]JPS5770396 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD); | [A]FR2222914 (BODENSEEWERK PERKIN ELMER CO [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 10, Nr. 177 (P-470)[2233], 21. Juni 1986; & JP-A-61 026 843 (SHIMADZU) 06-02-1986, & JP61026843 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 1, Nr. 73 (943)[E-77], 14. Juli 1977; & JP-A-52 010 797 (HITACHI) 27-01-1977, & JP52010797 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 4, Nr. 24 (E-173), 29. Februar 1980; & JP-A-54 162 596 (HITACHI) 24-12-1979, & JP54162596 A 00000000 |