EP0348975 - Copolymer of polymerizable components in naphtha oil and maleic anhydride, process for producing said copolymer, and derivatives thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAWASAKI STEEL CORPORATION No. 1-28, 1-Chome Kitahonmachi-Dori Chuo-Ku, Kobe-City Hyogo 651 / JP | [1992/27] |
Former [1990/01] | For all designated states KAWASAKI STEEL CORPORATION 1-28, Kitahonmachidori 1-chome Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Enomoto, Norihide Technical Research Division of Kawasaki Steel Corporation 1, Kawasaki-cho Chiba-shi Chiba / JP | 02 /
Naruse, Yoshihiro Technical Research Division of Kawasaki Steel Corporation 1, Kawasaki-cho Chiba-shi Chiba / JP | 03 /
Sugiura, Keiji Technical Research Division of Kawasaki Steel Corporation 1, Kawasaki-cho Chiba-shi Chiba / JP | 04 /
Ohtsu, Kimiyo Technical Research Division of Kawasaki Steel Corporation 1, Kawasaki-cho Chiba-shi Chiba / JP | 05 /
Takagi, Masato Technical Research Division of Kawasaki Steel Corporation 1, Kawasaki-cho Chiba-shi Chiba / JP | [1990/01] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/01] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89111862.2 | 29.06.1989 | [1990/01] | Priority number, date | JP19880163625 | 30.06.1988 Original published format: JP 16362588 | JP19880179460 | 19.07.1988 Original published format: JP 17946088 | JP19890096154 | 14.04.1989 Original published format: JP 9615489 | JP19890096155 | 14.04.1989 Original published format: JP 9615589 | JP19890096156 | 14.04.1989 Original published format: JP 9615689 | [1990/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0348975 | Date: | 03.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0348975 | Date: | 31.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0348975 | Date: | 17.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08F240/00, C08F222/06, C09K7/02, B01F17/00, C04B24/26, C08F8/44, C08F8/14 | [1990/01] | CPC: |
C04B24/22 (EP);
C08F212/00 (KR);
C09K23/08 (EP,KR,US);
C08F222/06 (EP,KR);
C08F240/00 (EP);
C09K23/00 (EP);
C09K8/24 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/01] | Title | German: | Copolymer von polymerisierbaren Komponenten in Benzinöl und Maleinsäure-Anhydrid, Verfahren zur Herstellung dieses Copolymers und Derivate davon | [1990/01] | English: | Copolymer of polymerizable components in naphtha oil and maleic anhydride, process for producing said copolymer, and derivatives thereof | [1990/01] | French: | Copolymère de composés polymérisables dans de l'huile d'essence et anhydride maléique, procédé de préparation d'un tel copolymère et ses dérivés | [1990/01] | Examination procedure | 29.06.1989 | Examination requested [1990/01] | 01.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 15.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 17.08.1994 | NL | 17.08.1994 | [2008/01] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 17.08.1994 | |
NL | 17.08.1994 | ||
Former [1995/15] | NL | 17.08.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2456358 (ALLEN HARRY L, et al); | [A]DE1110416 (BERGWERKSVERBAND GMBH); | [AD]US4117218 (LI GEORGE S); | [X]FR2387249 (NIPPON OIL CO LTD [JP], et al) |