EP0383993 - Component for a multiple-layer construction of flat material, in particular for motor vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.1992 [1992/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LAHNWERK GMBH + CO. KG Verformungstechnik Friedensdorf Wilhelmshütter Strasse 17 D-3563 Dautphetal / DE | [1990/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gröf, Wolfgang Im Hohental 4 D-6349 Mittenaar 2 / DE | 02 /
Schmidt, Walter Bahnhofstrasse 36 D-3563 Dautphetal / DE | 03 /
Geyer, Volker Danziger Strasse 19 D-4020 Mettmann / DE | [1990/35] | Representative(s) | Thielmann, Paul Am Eschenberg 14 35216 Biedenkopf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/35] | Thielmann, Paul, Dipl.-Landw. Am Eschenberg 14 D-35216 Biedenkopf / DE | Application number, filing date | 89111901.8 | 30.06.1989 | [1990/35] | Priority number, date | DE19893905056 | 18.02.1989 Original published format: DE 3905056 | [1990/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0383993 | Date: | 29.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16B5/00, B21D39/03 | [1990/35] | CPC: |
B21D39/034 (EP);
F16S1/08 (KR);
F16B5/045 (EP);
F16J15/0831 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/35] | Title | German: | Bauteil einer mehrschichtigen Flachmaterial-Konstruktion insbesondere für Kraftfahrzeuge | [1990/35] | English: | Component for a multiple-layer construction of flat material, in particular for motor vehicles | [1990/35] | French: | Elément d'une construction de matériels à plusieurs couches, notamment pour véhicules automobiles | [1990/35] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 19.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/50] | 21.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/48] | 02.07.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1992 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE918025 (NOLD & CO J F); | [A]GB2123734 (BTM CORP); | [AD]DE8632788U ; | [AP]DE3737210 (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) | [AD] - FACHZEITSCHRIFT "STAHL UND EISEN", Band 106, Nr. 8, 21. April 1986, Seiten 363-370, Düsseldorf, DE; H.P. LIEBIG et al.: "Über die Eignung höherfester Stahlbleche zum Druckfügen" |