EP0353473 - Method of bonding fibers to hydrogenated nitrile rubber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.1993 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.11.1993 [1993/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BANDO CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LIMITED 2-15, Meiwa-dori 3-chome Hyogo-ku Kobe City Hyogo Prefecture / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/06] | For all designated states BANDO CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LIMITED 2-15, Meiwa-dori 3-chome Hyogo-ku Kobe City Hyogo Prefecture / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujiwara, Akinori c/o Bando Chem. Ind., Ltd. 2-15, Meiwadori 3-chome Hyogo-ku Kobe / JP | 02 /
Matsuoka, Hiroshi c/o Bando Chem. Ind., Ltd. 2-15, Meiwadori 3-chome Hyogo-ku Kobe / JP | 03 /
Onoe, Susumu c/o Bando Chem. Ind., Ltd. 2-15, Meiwadori 3-chome Hyogo-ku Kobe / JP | 04 /
Kusaka, Kenji c/o Bando Chem. Ind., Ltd. 2-15, Meiwadori 3-chome Hyogo-ku Kobe / JP | [1990/06] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/06] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 89112194.9 | 04.07.1989 | [1990/06] | Priority number, date | JP19880169883 | 06.07.1988 Original published format: JP 16988388 | JP19880169884 | 06.07.1988 Original published format: JP 16988488 | JP19880169885 | 06.07.1988 Original published format: JP 16988588 | [1990/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0353473 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0353473 | Date: | 02.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/06, C08L15/00 | [1990/06] | CPC: |
C08J5/06 (EP,KR,US);
C08J2315/00 (EP,US);
Y10S156/91 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2938 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/06] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Kleben von Fasern an hydrogeniertem Nitrilkautschuk | [1990/06] | English: | Method of bonding fibers to hydrogenated nitrile rubber | [1990/06] | French: | Procédé de collage de fibres à du caoutchouc nitrile hydrogéné | [1990/06] | Examination procedure | 27.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/34] | 31.01.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.06.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0194678 (NIPPON ZEON CO [JP]) |