EP0349991 - Process for producing vitamin A or its carboxylic acid esters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.05.1995 [1995/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KURARAY CO., LTD. 1621 Sakazu Kurashiki-City / JP | [1990/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mori, Toshiki 1, Kurashiki-machi Nakajyo-cho Kitakanbara-gun Niigata Prefecture / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Shigeaki 1, Kurashiki-machi Nakajyo-cho Kitakanbara-gun Niigata Prefecture / JP | 03 /
Onishi, Takashi 1, Kurashiki-machi Nakajyo-cho Kitakanbara-gun Niigata Prefecture / JP | [1990/02] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/45] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 D-81671 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/02] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 02 47 D-80059 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89112218.6 | 04.07.1989 | [1990/02] | Priority number, date | JP19880168190 | 05.07.1988 Original published format: JP 16819088 | JP19880168191 | 05.07.1988 Original published format: JP 16819188 | [1990/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0349991 | Date: | 10.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0349991 | Date: | 31.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0349991 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07C403/08, C07C403/12 | [1990/02] | CPC: |
C07C403/08 (EP,US);
C07C403/12 (EP,US);
C07C403/22 (EP,US);
C07C2601/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1990/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Vitamin A oder ihren Carbonsäure-Estern | [1990/02] | English: | Process for producing vitamin A or its carboxylic acid esters | [1990/02] | French: | Procédé de préparation de la vitamine A ou des esters de ses acides carboxyliques | [1990/02] | Examination procedure | 17.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/12] | 09.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0187259 (KURARAY CO [JP]) | [A] - CHEMISTRY LETTERS, no. 12, December 1985, pages 1883-1886, The Chemical Society of Japan, Tokyo, JP; J. OTERA et al.: "The highly stereoselective synthesis of all-time and 13-cis vitamin A via double elimination reaction" |