EP0351642 - Mast for a sailboard [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.01.1991 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.1991 [1991/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boge A.G. Bogestrasse 50 D-53783 Eitorf / DE | For all designated states Blech, Siegfried Rosenweg 6a D-5960 Olpe-Sondern / DE | [1990/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Christiani, Gunter Kloster-Prümm-Strasse 22 D-5483 Bad Neuenahr/Ahrweiler / DE | 02 /
Brenner, Heinrich Am Thurmberg 11 D-5483 Bad Neuenahr/Ahrweiler / DE | 03 /
Blech, Siegfried Rosenweg 6a D-5960 Olpe-Sondern / DE | [1990/04] | Application number, filing date | 89112253.3 | 05.07.1989 | [1990/04] | Priority number, date | DE19883824031 | 15.07.1988 Original published format: DE 3824031 | DE19893914453 | 02.05.1989 Original published format: DE 3914453 | [1990/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0351642 | Date: | 24.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B63B15/00, // B63B35:79 | [1990/04] | CPC: |
B63H8/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, IT [1990/04] | Title | German: | Mast für ein Segelbrett | [1990/04] | English: | Mast for a sailboard | [1990/04] | French: | Mât d'une planche à voile | [1990/04] | File destroyed: | 04.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 25.07.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/11] | 15.10.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3300178 (GST SURFTECH [DE]); | [X]DE3629301 (MISTRAL WINDSURFING AG [CH]); | [X]DE8634426U ; | [X]EP0259929 (KONI BV [NL]); | [X]BE899692 (HERSTAL SA) |