EP0356668 - Process for preparing a fruity beverage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.1993 | Change - withdrawal | published on 17.03.1993 [1993/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Granini GmbH & Co. KG. Kammerratsheide 31a 33609 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/10] | For all designated states Deutsche Granini GmbH & Co. KG. Kammerratsheide 31a D-33609 Bielefeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Geiss, Helmut Hindemithweg 10 D-4815 Schloss Holte/Stukenbrock / DE | 02 /
Heil, Angelika Rosenstrasse 13 D-6229 Walluf / DE | 03 /
Szczecinski, Hans-Joachim, Dr. In der Loh 1 D-4503 Dissen / DE | [1990/10] | Representative(s) | Stracke, Alexander, et al Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/10] | Stracke, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing., et al Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 D-33613 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 89112649.2 | 11.07.1989 | [1990/10] | Priority number, date | DE19883829868 | 02.09.1988 Original published format: DE 3829868 | [1990/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0356668 | Date: | 07.03.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0356668 | Date: | 31.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A23L2/02, A23L2/16, A23P1/00, A23B7/04 | [1990/10] | CPC: |
A23L2/42 (EP);
A23B7/0433 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen eines fruchthaltigen Getränkes | [1990/10] | English: | Process for preparing a fruity beverage | [1990/10] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'une boisson contenant des fruits | [1990/10] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 27.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/09] | 17.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2667423 ; | [A]EP0246156 ; | [A]US4312889 ; | [A]FR2559244 ; | [A]EP0249446 |