EP0350866 - Photodetector system with controllable position-dependent sensitivity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 02.03.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.1996 | Opposition rejected | published on 17.04.1996 [1996/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hegyi, Dennis J. 1708 Morton Avenue Ann Arbor, MI 48104 / US | [1990/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/03] | Representative(s) | Müller, Hans-Jürgen, et al Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/03] | Müller, Hans-Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Müller, Schupfner & Gauger Postfach 10 11 61 D-80085 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89112665.8 | 11.07.1989 | [1990/03] | Priority number, date | US19880220021 | 15.07.1988 Original published format: US 220021 | [1990/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0350866 | Date: | 17.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0350866 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G01J1/06, H01L31/10 | [1990/03] | CPC: |
B60H1/0075 (EP,US);
G01J1/06 (EP,KR,US);
G01S3/783 (EP,US);
G01S3/787 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/03] | Title | German: | Photodetektorsystem mit beeinflussbarer positionsabhängiger Empfindlichkeit | [1990/03] | English: | Photodetector system with controllable position-dependent sensitivity | [1990/03] | French: | Système de photo-détecteur avec sensiblité contrôlable dépendant de la position | [1990/03] | Examination procedure | 10.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/39] | 16.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.07.1994
23.08.1994
ADMISSIBLE Hella KG Hueck & Co. Rixbecker Strasse 75 D-59552 Lippstadt / DE | [1994/37] | 31.08.1994 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.12.1994 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 20.11.1995 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 30.11.1995 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1996/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [1995/41] |
Former [1995/03] | FR | 11.03.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2440168 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE); | [A]DE2327837 ; | [A]GB2192709 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD, et al) |