EP0355372 - Data carrier controlled terminal for a data exchange system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 15.04.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SPA Syspatronic AG Lauriedstrasse 7 6300 Zug / CH | [2003/02] |
Former [1990/09] | For all designated states SPA Syspatronic AG Industriestrasse 31 Postfach 2066 CH-6302 Zug / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwartz, Hermann Schützenstrasse 18 CH-8808 Pfäffikon SZ / CH | [1990/09] | Representative(s) | Heusch, Christian OK pat AG Industriestrasse 47 6300 Zug / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2002/51] | Heusch, Christian OK pat AG Chamerstrasse 50 6300 Zug / CH | ||
Former [1995/11] | OK pat AG Hinterbergstrasse 36, Postfach 5254 CH-6330 Cham / CH | ||
Former [1990/09] | Kägi, Otto Patentanwalt St. Jakobstrasse 48 Postfach 201 CH-6330 Cham / CH | Application number, filing date | 89112745.8 | 12.07.1989 | [1990/09] | Priority number, date | CH19880002777 | 20.07.1988 Original published format: CH 277788 | [1990/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0355372 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0355372 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/10, G06K19/06 | [1990/09] | CPC: |
G07F7/1008 (EP,US);
G06K19/073 (EP,US);
G06K19/07743 (EP,US);
G06K7/0034 (EP,US);
G06K7/0047 (EP,US);
G06Q20/229 (EP,US);
G06Q20/341 (EP,US);
G06Q20/367 (EP,US);
G06Q20/382 (EP,US);
G06Q20/40975 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/09] | Title | German: | Datenträger-gesteuertes Endgerät in einem Datenaustauschsystem | [1990/09] | English: | Data carrier controlled terminal for a data exchange system | [1990/09] | French: | Terminal commandé par support de données dans un système d'échange de données | [1990/09] | Examination procedure | 16.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/41] | 22.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.12.1995
09.01.1996
ADMISSIBLE GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE Opponent's representative Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.12.1995
09.01.1996
ADMISSIBLE GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 D-81677 München / DE Opponent's representative Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.12.1995
GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 D-81677 München / DE | 31.01.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.06.1996 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.06.1996 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06) | 24.12.1996 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 01.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 24.09.1998 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.10.1998 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 26.10.1998 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 28.11.2002 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2003/22] | Appeal following opposition | 15.12.1998 | Appeal received No. T1164/98 | 05.03.1999 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.11.2002 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 28.11.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.12.2002 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3023427 (GRETAG AG); | [AD]EP0049650 (CII HONEYWELL BULL [FR]); | [X]EP0096599 (CII HONEYWELL BULL [FR]); | [X]EP0111381 (BURROUGHS CORP [US]); | [A]DE3435697 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [AD]EP0193920 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US4709136 (WATANABE HIROSHI [JP]); | [A]WO8801818 (WRIGHT CHRISTOPHER B [US], et al); | [A]WO8803297 (NIXFLU AB [SE]); | [XP]EP0305004 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) |