EP0366868 - Substained release pharmaceutical composition containing alginate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.1993 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.09.1993 [1993/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNOLL AG Postfach 21 08 05 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/19] | For all designated states KNOLL AG Postfach 21 08 05 D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Balz, Evamarie Naechstenbacher Weg 93 D-6940 Weinheim / DE | 02 /
Einig, Heinz, Dr. Aspenweg 12 D-6730 Neustadt / DE | 03 /
Dresen, Peter, Dr. Im Wingert 6 d D-6806 Viernheim / DE | [1990/19] | Representative(s) | Höller, Klaus, et al BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung ZDX - C 6 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/19] | Höller, Klaus, Dr., et al BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung ZDX - C 6 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 89112885.2 | 13.07.1989 | [1990/19] | Priority number, date | DE19883823693 | 13.07.1988 Original published format: DE 3823693 | [1990/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0366868 | Date: | 09.05.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0366868 | Date: | 30.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/275, A61K9/22, A61K9/26 | [1990/19] | CPC: |
A61K9/205 (EP,US);
A61K31/275 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | ES [1990/19] | Title | German: | Arzneimittel-Depotform auf Alginatbasis | [1990/19] | English: | Substained release pharmaceutical composition containing alginate | [1990/19] | French: | Composition pharmaceutique à effet retard contenant un alginate | [1990/19] | Examination procedure | 01.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/19] | 18.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.02.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.02.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0063266 (BASF AG [DE]); | [XP]GB2207353 (SQUIBB & SONS INC) | [YD] - ARZNEIM. -FORSCH. (DRUG RES.), Band 25, Nr. 8, 1975, Seiten 1272-1275; D. MAYER et al.: "Entwicklung einer oralen Retardform von Verapamil und Prüfung der Resorption am narkotisierten Hund" | [Y] - JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, band 3, Nr. 2/3, März 1986, Seiten 167-175, Elsevier Science Publishers B.V., Amsterdam, NL; A.F. STOCKWELL et al.: "In vitro evaluation of alginate gel systems as sustained release drug delivery systems" |