EP0351723 - Tubular torsion spring device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.1991 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUDI AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/04] | For all designated states AUDI AG D-85045 Ingolstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schäper, Siegfried, Dr. Am Fort 5 D-8071 Wettstetten / DE | 02 /
Haldenwanger, Hans-Günther Behaimstrasse 16a D-8070 Ingolstadt / DE | [1990/04] | Representative(s) | le Vrang, Klaus AUDI AG Patentabteilung 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/28] | le Vrang, Klaus AUDI AG Patentabteilung 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | ||
Former [1990/04] | Le Vrang, Klaus c/o AUDI AG,Patentabteilung D-85045 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 89112917.3 | 14.07.1989 | [1990/04] | Priority number, date | DE19883824933 | 22.07.1988 Original published format: DE 3824933 | [1990/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0351723 | Date: | 24.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0351723 | Date: | 05.12.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16F1/14, F16C3/02, B29C47/02, B29C63/14 | [1990/04] | CPC: |
B29C70/207 (EP,US);
B29C48/07 (EP,US);
B29C48/09 (EP,US);
B29C48/12 (EP,US);
B29C48/131 (EP,US);
B29C48/304 (EP,US);
B29C48/33 (EP,US);
B29C53/583 (EP);
B29C53/66 (EP);
F16C3/026 (EP);
F16D3/725 (EP);
F16F1/366 (EP);
B29L2009/00 (EP);
B29L2031/774 (EP);
B60G2202/13 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1990/04] | Title | German: | Rohrförmiges, tordierbares Federelement | [1990/04] | English: | Tubular torsion spring device | [1990/04] | French: | Elément formant ressort à torsion tubulaire | [1990/04] | File destroyed: | 04.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 14.07.1989 | Examination requested [1990/04] | 02.02.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/13] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6117731 ; | [A]JPS60162605 ; | [A]JPS5234161 ; | [A]JPS6121433 ; | [A]GB1147621 (GEN CABLE CORP [US]); | [A]US3628352 (STUEMKY ROBERT E); | [A]US4322260 (CONLON LAWRENCE E); | [Y]EP0145810 (SCHNELL JOACHIM DR); | [Y]FR2600013 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 167 (M-488)(2223) 13 Juni 1986& JP-A-61 17731 (NIHON HATSUJIYOU KK) 25 Januar 1986, | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 330 (M-442)(2053) 25 Dezember 1985& JP-A-60 162605 (MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KK) 24 August 1985, | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1, no. 93 (M-032)() 26 August 1977& JP-A-52 34161 (SUMITOMO DENKI KOGYO KK) 15 März 1977, | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 171 (M-489)(2227) 17 Juni 1986& JP-A-61 21433 (NIHON HATSUJIYOU KK) 30 Januar 1986, |