EP0351743 - Sheet-turning device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trauschke, Siegfried Am Waldhang 23 84172 Buch / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/04] | For all designated states Trauschke, Siegfried Am Waldhang 23 D-84172 Buch / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/04] | Representative(s) | Gustorf, Gerhard Bachstrasse 6a 84036 Landshut / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | Gustorf, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Gerhard Gustorf Bachstrasse 6 A D-84036 Landshut / DE | ||
Former [1990/04] | Gustorf, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Gerhard Gustorf Bachstrasse 6 A D-84036 Landshut / DE | Application number, filing date | 89113017.1 | 15.07.1989 | [1990/04] | Priority number, date | DE19880009130U | 16.07.1988 Original published format: DE 8809130 U | [1990/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0351743 | Date: | 24.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0351743 | Date: | 30.05.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0351743 | Date: | 07.12.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B42D9/04 | [1990/04] | CPC: |
B42D9/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/04] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Wenden von Blättern von Schriftgut | [1990/04] | English: | Sheet-turning device | [1990/04] | French: | Dispositif pour tourner des feuilles de papier | [1990/04] | Examination procedure | 30.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/04] | 21.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/48] | Request for further processing for: | 12.05.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 12.05.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.06.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.08.1989 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   19.09.1989 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1991 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 07.12.1994 | AT | 15.07.1995 | GB | 15.07.1995 | SE | 16.07.1995 | ES | 17.07.1995 | BE | 31.07.1995 | CH | 31.07.1995 | LI | 31.07.1995 | LU | 31.07.1995 | [2004/37] |
Former [2000/04] | GR | 07.12.1994 | |
AT | 15.07.1995 | ||
GB | 15.07.1995 | ||
SE | 16.07.1995 | ||
BE | 31.07.1995 | ||
CH | 31.07.1995 | ||
LI | 31.07.1995 | ||
LU | 31.07.1995 | ||
Former [1997/13] | AT | 15.07.1995 | |
GB | 15.07.1995 | ||
SE | 16.07.1995 | ||
BE | 31.07.1995 | ||
CH | 31.07.1995 | ||
LI | 31.07.1995 | ||
Former [1997/03] | AT | 15.07.1995 | |
GB | 15.07.1995 | ||
SE | 16.07.1995 | ||
BE | 31.07.1995 | ||
Former [1996/31] | GB | 15.07.1995 | |
SE | 16.07.1995 | ||
BE | 31.07.1995 | ||
Former [1996/30] | GB | 15.07.1995 | |
SE | 16.07.1995 | ||
Former [1996/23] | SE | 16.07.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE293329 ; | [Y]US1716693 (HALEMEYER HENRY C); | [X]US1720827 (ALBERT ERICSSON) |