EP0351848 - Voice synthesizing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.05.1995 [1995/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/04] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kitoh, Atsunori 12-6, Imazato-cho Yamatotakada-shi Nara-ken / JP | 02 /
Fujimoto, Yoshiji 1837-57, Shoyodai 2-chome Nara-shi Nara-ken / JP | [1990/04] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/04] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89113343.1 | 20.07.1989 | [1990/04] | Priority number, date | JP19880183906 | 21.07.1988 Original published format: JP 18390688 | [1990/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0351848 | Date: | 24.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0351848 | Date: | 21.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0351848 | Date: | 18.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G10L5/04 | [1990/04] | CPC: |
G10L13/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1990/04] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Sprachsynthese | [1990/04] | English: | Voice synthesizing device | [1990/04] | French: | Dispositif de synthèse de la parole | [1990/04] | Examination procedure | 27.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/43] | 26.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0081595 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]); | [A]WO8504747 (FIRST BYTE [US]) |