EP0351854 - Serial recording apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.1995 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.10.1995 [1995/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/04] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kimura, Tetsuo 10-4, Higashi Ohnuma 3-chome Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Saito, Takashi 17-14, Eda Higashi 1-chome Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Yoshimura, Shigeru 9-7, Matsukazedai Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1990/04] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/05] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/04] | Grupe, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne-Grupe-Pellmann-Grams-Struif-Winter-Roth Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89113353.0 | 20.07.1989 | [1990/04] | Priority number, date | JP19880182067 | 21.07.1988 Original published format: JP 18206788 | JP19880182068 | 21.07.1988 Original published format: JP 18206888 | JP19880182069 | 21.07.1988 Original published format: JP 18206988 | [1990/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0351854 | Date: | 24.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0351854 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0351854 | Date: | 19.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B41J19/20 | [1990/04] | CPC: |
B41J19/207 (EP,US);
B41J19/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/04] | Title | German: | Serienaufzeichnungsgerät | [1990/04] | English: | Serial recording apparatus | [1990/04] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement en série | [1990/04] | Examination procedure | 13.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/02] | 27.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP6157365 ; | [YD]US4672256 (OKUNO TAKUO [JP], et al); | [Y]US4044881 (CHAI HI DONG, et al) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 218 (M-503)(2274) 30 July 1986, & JP-A-61 57365 (CANON) 24 March 1986,, & JP6157365 A 19860324 |