EP0361010 - Spring arm contact with assist spring surrounding the socket [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.1991 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.1991 | Change - withdrawal | published on 07.08.1991 [1991/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grote & Hartmann GmbH & Co. KG Am Kraftwerk 13 Postfach 21 03 20 D-5600 Wuppertal 21 / DE | [1990/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zinn, Bernd Peter-Alfs Str. 6 D-5828 Ennepetal / DE | [1990/14] | Representative(s) | Dr. Solf & Zapf Patent- und Rechtsanwalts PartG mbB Postfach 13 01 13 42028 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/14] | Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Postfach 13 01 13 D-42028 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 89113514.7 | 22.07.1989 | [1990/14] | Priority number, date | DE19880011020U | 31.08.1988 Original published format: DE 8811020 U | [1990/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0361010 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/18 | [1990/14] | CPC: |
H01R13/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/14] | Title | German: | Federarmkontakt mit Aussenüberfeder | [1990/14] | English: | Spring arm contact with assist spring surrounding the socket | [1990/14] | French: | Contact à ressort à bras avec un ressort assistant entourant l'alvéole | [1990/14] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 02.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/31] | 05.06.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/32] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4583812 (GROSS JR ROBERT E [US], et al); | [A]EP0189821 (REINSHAGEN KABELWERK GMBH [DE]) | [Y] - O. RICHTER et al.: "BAUELEMENTE DER FEINMECHANIK" |