EP0352682 - Twice reactive dyes and benzyl compounds as their intermediary products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1994 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.01.1995 [1995/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/05] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Patsch, Manfred, Dr. Fritz-Wendel-Strasse 4 D-6706 Wachenheim / DE | 02 /
Nahr, Uwe, Dr. In den Pfützen 19 D-6701 Dannstadt-Schauernheim / DE | 03 /
Wirsing, Friedrich, Dr. Vergissmeinnichtweg 4 D-6720 Speyer / DE | 04 /
Jessen, Joerg L., Dr. Maulbeerstück 20 D-6720 Speyer / DE | 05 /
Pandl, Klaus, Dr. Schumannstrasse 18 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 06 /
Marschner, Claus, Dr. Franz-Boegler-Weg 3 D-6720 Speyer / DE | 07 /
Dust, Matthias, Dr. Teichgasse 7 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | [1990/05] | Application number, filing date | 89113540.2 | 22.07.1989 | [1990/05] | Priority number, date | DE19883825656 | 28.07.1988 Original published format: DE 3825656 | [1990/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0352682 | Date: | 31.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0352682 | Date: | 10.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0352682 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C09B62/503, C09B62/022, C07C317/00, C07C323/00 | [1990/05] | CPC: |
C07C317/14 (EP);
C07C317/32 (EP);
C09B62/02 (EP);
C09B62/4403 (EP);
C09B62/503 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1990/05] | Title | German: | Neue Doppelankerreaktivfarbstoffe und Benzylverbindungen als deren Zwischenprodukte | [1990/05] | English: | Twice reactive dyes and benzyl compounds as their intermediary products | [1990/05] | French: | Colorants à deux groupements réactifs et composés benzyliques comme produits intermédiaires | [1990/05] | Examination procedure | 07.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/44] | 11.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 27.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 30.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0181585 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [A]EP0197418 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [A]US3531459 (CHIDDIX MAX EUGENE, et al); | [A]EP0307817 (BASF AG [DE]) |