EP0410021 - Process and apparatus for automatically replacing bobbin adaptors loaded with empty bobbins by bobbin adaptors loaded with full bobbins at the processing station of a textile machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 21.01.1998 [1998/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Palitex Project-Company GmbH Weeserweg 60 D-47804 Krefeld / DE | [1991/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inger, Siegfried, Dipl.-Ing. Nordring 56 D-4156 Tönisvorst 1 / DE | [1991/05] | Representative(s) | Sroka, Peter-Christian, et al Bauer Wagner Pellengahr Sroka Patent- & Rechtsanwalts PartG mbB Grüner Weg 1 52070 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/05] | Sroka, Peter-Christian, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt Postfach 11 10 38 D-40510 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 89113551.9 | 24.07.1989 | [1991/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0410021 | Date: | 30.01.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0410021 | Date: | 02.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | D01H9/10, B65H54/26 | [1991/05] | CPC: |
D01H9/10 (EP,US);
B65H54/26 (EP,US);
B65H67/02 (EP,US);
B65H2701/31 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1991/05] | Title | German: | Betriebsverfahren und Vorrichtung zum automatisierten Auswechseln von mit leeren Hülsen bestückten Spulenadaptern gegen mit vollen Vorlagespulen bestückte Spulenadapter im Bereich einer Fadenbearbeitungsstelle einer Textilmaschine | [1991/05] | English: | Process and apparatus for automatically replacing bobbin adaptors loaded with empty bobbins by bobbin adaptors loaded with full bobbins at the processing station of a textile machine | [1991/05] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour remplacer automatiquement les adaptateurs pour bobines garnis de bobines vides avec les adaptateurs pour bobines garnis de bobines pleines dans le poste de traitement de fil d'une machine textile | [1991/05] | Examination procedure | 17.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/07] | 14.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 24.07.1996 | CH | 31.07.1996 | LI | 31.07.1996 | [1998/04] |
Former [1997/30] | GB | 24.07.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3824998 (MURATA MACHINERY LTD [JP]); | [A]DE2811128 (TEIJIN LTD); | [A]DE1932014 (PARKS CRAMER CO) | Examination | EP0310567 |