EP0410026 - Induction furnace [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.04.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.1993 | Refusal of application | published on 16.06.1993 [1993/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VSESOJUZNY NAUCHNO-ISSLEDOVATELSKY PROEKTNO-KONSTRUKTORSKY I TEKHNOLOGICHESKY INST. ELEKTROTERMICHESKOGO OBORUDOVANIA VNIIETO ul. Nizhegorodskaya, 29 Moscow 109052 / SU | [N/P] |
Former [1991/05] | For all designated states VSESOJUZNY NAUCHNO-ISSLEDOVATELSKY PROEKTNO-KONSTRUKTORSKY I TEKHNOLOGICHESKY INSTITUT ELEKTROTERMICHESKOGO OBORUDOVANIA VNIIETO, ul. Nizhegorodskaya, 29 Moscow 109052 / SU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Slotintsev, Nikolai Matveevich Khimki ulitsa Moskovskaya, 30, kv.40 Moskovskaya oblast / SU | 02 /
Rytvin, Evgeny Isaevich ulitsa Vorovskogo, 23a, kv.24 Moscow / SU | 03 /
Roginsky, Semen Lvovich ulitsa Sannikova, 1, kv.262 Moscow / SU | 04 /
Shiman, Oleg Petrovich Polotsk prospekt K.Marxa, 37 Vitebskaya oblast / SU | 05 /
Trofimov, Nikolai Nikolaevich korpus 162, kv.173 Zelenograd / SU | 06 /
Pershin, Viktor Alexandrovich Solnechnogorsky raion poselok Andreevka, 3, kv.19 Moskovskaya oblast / SU | 07 /
Gubchenko, Alexandr Pavlovich ulitsa Tashkentskaya, 4 korpus 2, kv.27 Moscow / SU | 08 /
Sheffer, Sergei Leonidovich ulitsa Koptevskaya, 34 korpus 2, kv.55 Moscow / SU | 09 /
Kuzovlev, Igor Valentinovich Gurievsky proezd, 29 korpus 1, kv. 192 Moscow / SU | 10 /
Dreitser, Vladimir Lvovich korpus 1015, kv.110 Zelenograd Moscow / SU | [1991/05] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/05] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89113611.1 | 24.07.1989 | [1991/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0410026 | Date: | 30.01.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F27D11/12, H05B6/22, F27B14/10, F27B14/04, F27B14/06 | [1991/05] | CPC: |
F27B14/04 (EP);
F27B14/063 (EP);
F27D11/12 (EP);
H05B6/22 (EP);
F27B2014/008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1991/05] | Title | German: | Induktionsschmelzofen | [1991/05] | English: | Induction furnace | [1991/05] | French: | Four à induction | [1991/05] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 01.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/14] | 22.07.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.01.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1993/24] | 30.01.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1992 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1283982 ; | [Y]EP0276544 ; | [A]DE697555 |