EP0358898 - Polyphenylene ether/polyolefin compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [1990/12] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady New York 12305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Gim Fun, Jr. 11 Drawbridge Drive Albany New York 12203 / US | 02 /
Yates, John Bennie, III 38 Chrisken Drive Glenmont New York 12077 / US | [1990/12] | Representative(s) | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/45] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1992/28] | Pratt, Richard Wilson London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1990/12] | Catherine, Alain General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18 Rue Horace Vernet F-92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 89113650.9 | 25.07.1989 | [1990/12] | Priority number, date | US19880232611 | 15.08.1988 Original published format: US 232611 | [1990/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0358898 | Date: | 21.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0358898 | Date: | 28.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08L71/12, C08L23/00, C08L53/02 | [1990/12] | CPC: |
C08L23/02 (EP,US);
C08L71/123 (EP,US);
Y10S525/905 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/02, C08L2666/22 (US,EP);
C08L23/02, C08L2666/24 (EP,US);
C08L71/123, C08L2666/04 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/12] | Title | German: | Polyphenylenether und Polyolefin enthaltende Zusammensetzungen | [1990/12] | English: | Polyphenylene ether/polyolefin compositions | [1990/12] | French: | Compositions à base d'un poly(éther de phénylène) et d'une polyoléfine | [1990/12] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 26.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/26] | 28.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/19] | 08.12.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4110303 (GERGEN WILLIAM P, et al); | [Y]US4242263 (LEE GIM F JR [US]) |