EP0357932 - Driving method for a solid-state imaging device for improving smear phenomenon [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.04.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.06.1994 [1994/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/33] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1990/11] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iijima, Takashi c/o Nec Corporation 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1990/11] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/11] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89113798.6 | 26.07.1989 | [1990/11] | Priority number, date | JP19880188728 | 27.07.1988 Original published format: JP 18872888 | [1990/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0357932 | Date: | 14.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/217, H04N5/335 | [1990/11] | CPC: |
H04N25/625 (EP,US);
H04N25/715 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/11] | Title | German: | Ansteuerverfahren für einen Festkörper-Bildaufnehmer zur Verhinderung der Verschmierungserscheinung | [1990/11] | English: | Driving method for a solid-state imaging device for improving smear phenomenon | [1990/11] | French: | Procédé d'attaque pour un capteur d'image à l'état solide pour éviter l'effet de traînage | [1990/11] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 26.07.1989 | Examination requested [1990/11] | 12.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4032976 (LEVINE PETER ALAN); | [A]US4040092 (CARNES JAMES EDWARD); | [AP]GB2200509 (SONY CORP); | [AP]EP0295977 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) |