EP0352772 - Method for preparing resin having light color [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.1993 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2009 | Change - representative | published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Oil Co., Ltd. 3-12, Nishishinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/05] | For all designated states NIPPON OIL CO., LTD. 3-12, Nishishinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sasaki, Makoto 338, Iwaicho Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Kobayashi, Yukio 3-2-1-912, Minami-suna Koto-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Tsuchiya, Shozo 2-10-8, Minami Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | [1990/05] | Representative(s) | Wehnert, Werner, et al Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons, Schildberg Schwanthalerstrasse 106 80339 München / DE | [2010/01] |
Former [1990/05] | Wehnert, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Mozartstrasse 23 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89113800.0 | 26.07.1989 | [1990/05] | Priority number, date | JP19880185427 | 27.07.1988 Original published format: JP 18542788 | [1990/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0352772 | Date: | 31.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0352772 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08F32/08 | [1990/05] | CPC: |
C08G61/08 (EP,US);
C07C5/05 (EP,US);
C08F32/08 (EP,US);
C07C2531/02 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C5/05, C07C13/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/05] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines wenig kolorierten Harzes | [1990/05] | English: | Method for preparing resin having light color | [1990/05] | French: | Méthode de préparation d'une résine peu colorée | [1990/05] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 27.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/09] | 18.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/03] | 25.08.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1993 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB1262050 (ARAKAWA RINSAN KAGAKU KOGYO [JP]); | [A]FR2161524 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE) |