EP0410035 - Box for several drawers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.10.1994 [1994/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REPPEL-PLASTIC GMBH Strandbadweg 16-18 D-58566 Kierspe / DE | [1991/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reppel, Paul Ölmühlerweg 5 D-5883 Kierspe-Rönsahl / DE | [1991/05] | Representative(s) | Hassler, Werner Postfach 17 04 58467 Lüdenscheid / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/05] | Hassler, Werner, Dr. Postfach 17 04 D-58467 Lüdenscheid / DE | Application number, filing date | 89113841.4 | 27.07.1989 | [1991/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0410035 | Date: | 30.01.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0410035 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A47B87/02 | [1991/05] | CPC: |
A47B87/0292 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1991/05] | Title | German: | Box für mehrere Einschübe | [1991/05] | English: | Box for several drawers | [1991/05] | French: | Boîtier pour plusieurs tiroirs | [1991/05] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 10.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.08.1990 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   05.09.1990 | 10.08.1990 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   05.09.1990 | 10.08.1990 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   05.09.1990 | 10.08.1990 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   05.09.1990 | 10.08.1990 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   05.09.1990 | 10.08.1990 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   05.09.1990 | 10.08.1990 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   05.09.1990 | 10.08.1990 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   05.09.1990 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3003839 (ELI BLOOM, et al); | [A]DE2244654 (BONACINA RENZO); | [X]DE2329016 (DROSZELLA EITEL) | Examination | DE2811823 |