EP0353722 - Carbonylation process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/06] | Carbonylation reaction and catalyst therefor | ||
[1994/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS AND PLASTICS COMPANY INC. (a New York corporation) 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/06] | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS AND PLASTICS COMPANY INC. (a New York corporation) 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wegman, Richard William 912 Glendale Avenue South Charleston West Virginia 25303 / US | [1990/06] | Representative(s) | Barz, Peter, et al Schmied-Kowarzik & Partner Patentanwälte Siegfriedstrasse 8 80803 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Barz, Peter, et al Schmied-Kowarzik & Partner Patentanwälte Siegfriedstrasse 8 80803 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/06] | Barz, Peter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. G. Dannenberg Dr. P. Weinhold, Dr. D. Gudel Dipl.-Ing. S. Schubert, Dr. P. Barz Siegfriedstrasse 8 D-80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89114222.6 | 01.08.1989 | [1990/06] | Priority number, date | US19880227295 | 02.08.1988 Original published format: US 227295 | [1990/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0353722 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0353722 | Date: | 31.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0353722 | Date: | 13.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07C67/36, C07C67/37, C07C69/14 | [1990/06] | CPC: |
B01J27/188 (EP,US);
B01J23/30 (EP,US);
B01J23/6527 (EP,US);
B01J27/185 (EP,US);
B01J27/186 (EP,US);
C07C51/12 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C67/36, C07C69/14 (US,EP);
C07C67/37, C07C69/14 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1990/06] | Title | German: | Carbonylierungsverfahren | [1994/28] | English: | Carbonylation process | [1994/28] | French: | Procédé de carbonylation | [1994/28] |
Former [1990/06] | Carbonylierungsreaktion und Katalysator dafür | ||
Former [1990/06] | Carbonylation reaction and catalyst therefor | ||
Former [1990/06] | Réaction de carbonylation et catalyseur à cet effet | Examination procedure | 28.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 15.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP94100031.7 / EP0596859 | EP97101741.3 / EP0782979 | Opposition(s) | 14.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 13.07.1994 | [2008/01] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 13.07.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0099665 (CHEVRON RES [US]); | [A]EP0130058 (CHEVRON RES [US]) |