EP0354458 - Photoinitiators with a combined structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.1991 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.1994 | Change - applicant | published on 16.03.1994 [1994/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Postfach Frankfurter Strasse 250 64271 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Postfach, Frankfurter Strasse 250 D-64271 Darmstadt / DE | ||
Former [1990/07] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Postfach, Frankfurter Strasse 250 D-64271 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Köhler, Manfred, Dr. Hebbelstrasse 38 D-6100 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
Ohngemach, Jörg, Dr. Taubenstrasse 6 D-6107 Reinheim / DE | [1990/07] | Application number, filing date | 89114238.2 | 02.08.1989 | [1990/07] | Priority number, date | DE19883826947 | 09.08.1988 Original published format: DE 3826947 | [1990/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0354458 | Date: | 14.02.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0354458 | Date: | 10.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07D335/16, G03F7/00 | [1990/07] | CPC: |
C07D335/16 (EP,US);
C08F2/50 (EP,US);
G03F7/031 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/07] | Title | German: | Fotoinitiatoren kombinierter Struktur | [1990/07] | English: | Photoinitiators with a combined structure | [1990/07] | French: | Photo-initiateurs à combinaison de structures | [1990/07] | File destroyed: | 09.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 11.04.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/50] | 15.07.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]DE2722264 (MERCK PATENT GMBH); | [Y]DE3018891 (CIBA GEIGY AG) |