EP0358928 - Machine-tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.1994 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.12.1994 [1994/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arnold Müller GmbH & Co. KG Klosterstrasse 48 D-73230 Kirchheim / DE | [1990/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Arnold Sperberweg 14 D-7312 Kirchheim/Teck / DE | 02 /
Vogt, Günther, Dr.-Ing. Habichtweg 18 D-7312 Kirchheim/Teck / DE | [1990/12] | Representative(s) | Kratzsch, Volkhard Patentanwalt Postfach 90 73701 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/12] | Kratzsch, Volkhard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Postfach 90 D-73701 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 89114431.3 | 04.08.1989 | [1990/12] | Priority number, date | DE19883831158 | 13.09.1988 Original published format: DE 3831158 | [1990/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0358928 | Date: | 21.03.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0358928 | Date: | 25.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0358928 | Date: | 15.12.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B21D43/10, B23Q7/04, B30B1/18 | [1991/32] | CPC: |
B21D43/10 (EP);
B23Q1/4828 (EP);
B23Q5/40 (EP);
B23Q7/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1991/09] | B21D43/10, B23Q7/04 | ||
Former IPC [1990/12] | B23Q7/04, B21D43/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1990/12] | Title | German: | Werkzeugmaschine | [1990/12] | English: | Machine-tool | [1990/12] | French: | Machine-outil | [1990/12] | Examination procedure | 14.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/16] | 08.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP59053103 [ ]; | JP60247496 [ ]; | JP61242797 [ ]; | [Y]DE838986 (WEINGARTEN AG MASCHF); | [A]FR1375902 (L B M ATEL); | [Y]GB1106852 (HASENCLEVER AG MASCHF); | [A]DE1902277 (GEORG DR ING OTTO); | [Y]DE2001357 (MICROMATIC HONE CORP); | [Y]DE1918637 (BECORIT GRUBENAUSBAU GMBH); | [X]DE2364718 (HOHE KG); | [A]DE2456729 (LANGENSTEIN & SCHEMANN AG); | [X]EP0028735 (FANUC LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0047056 (DANLY MACHINE CORP [US]); | [A]EP0090357 (SANKYO SEIKI SEISAKUSHO KK [JP]); | [A]EP0106244 (MUELLER ARNOLD [DE]); | [A]SE456877 (CERAC INST SA [CH]); | [AP]DE3841852 (FRANEK JOHANN DIPL ING FH [DE]) | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 8, Nr. 158 (M-311)(1595), 21. Juli 1984; & JP,A,59 053 103 (KIRIYUU KIKAI) 27.03.1984., & JP59053103 A 00000000 | [ ] - Werkstattstechnik, Band 73, Nr. 3, Maerz 1983, Seiten 169-173, Wuerzburg, DE; G. STUTE et al.: "Spindasyn, ein neuer elektromechanischer Linearantrieb fuer NC-Werkzeugmaschinen". | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 10, Nr. 118 (M-475)(2175), 2. Mai 1986; & JP,A,60 247 496 (MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K.) 07.12.1985., & JP60247496 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 11, Nr. 90 (M-573)(2537), 20. Maerz 1987; & JP,A,61 242 797 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP.) 29.10.1986., & JP61242797 A 00000000 | Examination | JP61242797 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN ; Band 11, Nr. 90 (M-573)(2537), 20 März 1987 & JP-A-61242797 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP.) 29.10.1986, & JP61242797 A 00000000 |