EP0358956 - Device for cleaning the cavity between a dental bridge element and the gum [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bauer, Helmut Ludwigstrasse 2 D-94032 Passau / DE | [1990/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/12] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/12] | Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7/II Aufg. D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89114939.5 | 11.08.1989 | [1990/12] | Priority number, date | DE19883831039 | 12.09.1988 Original published format: DE 3831039 | [1990/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0358956 | Date: | 21.03.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0358956 | Date: | 03.11.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61C15/04 | [1990/12] | CPC: |
A61C15/046 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/12] | Title | German: | Reinigungsvorrichtung für den Raum zwischen der basalen Auflage eines Brückengliedes einer Zahnbrücke und der Schleimhaut des Kieferkammes | [1990/12] | English: | Device for cleaning the cavity between a dental bridge element and the gum | [1990/12] | French: | Dispositif de nettoyage de l'espace entre un élément de pont dentaire et la gencive | [1990/12] | Examination procedure | 19.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/46] | 20.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 03.11.1993 | ES | 03.11.1993 | FR | 03.11.1993 | GB | 03.11.1993 | GR | 03.11.1993 | IT | 03.11.1993 | NL | 03.11.1993 | SE | 03.11.1993 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/24] | BE | 03.11.1993 | |
ES | 03.11.1993 | ||
GB | 03.11.1993 | ||
GR | 03.11.1993 | ||
IT | 03.11.1993 | ||
NL | 03.11.1993 | ||
SE | 03.11.1993 | ||
FR | 25.03.1994 | ||
Former [2000/04] | BE | 03.11.1993 | |
GB | 03.11.1993 | ||
GR | 03.11.1993 | ||
IT | 03.11.1993 | ||
NL | 03.11.1993 | ||
SE | 03.11.1993 | ||
FR | 25.03.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 03.11.1993 | |
GB | 03.11.1993 | ||
IT | 03.11.1993 | ||
NL | 03.11.1993 | ||
SE | 03.11.1993 | ||
FR | 25.03.1994 | ||
Former [1995/03] | BE | 03.11.1993 | |
GB | 03.11.1993 | ||
NL | 03.11.1993 | ||
SE | 03.11.1993 | ||
FR | 25.03.1994 | ||
Former [1994/49] | BE | 03.11.1993 | |
GB | 03.11.1993 | ||
NL | 03.11.1993 | ||
SE | 03.11.1993 | ||
Former [1994/48] | BE | 03.11.1993 | |
NL | 03.11.1993 | ||
SE | 03.11.1993 | ||
Former [1994/39] | NL | 03.11.1993 | |
SE | 03.11.1993 | ||
Former [1994/28] | SE | 03.11.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4008727 (THORNTON THOMAS F); | [A]DE2923057 (DOLINSKY JOSEF); | [A]DE8708369U |