EP0355658 - Semiconductor diffusion furnace inner tube [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.08.1994 [1994/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/09] | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsumoto, Fukuji No. 2-21, Kitago 3-chome Takefu-shi Fukui-ken / JP | 02 /
Tawara, Yoshio No. 1603, Nakano 1-chome Fukui-shi Fukui-ken / JP | 03 /
Hayashi, Michio Shin-Etsu Jutaku No. 16, Hachiman 1-chome Takefu-shi Fukui-ken / JP | 04 /
Yamada, Osamu No. 12-9, Hinode 5-chome Fukui-shi Fukui-ken / JP | [1990/09] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/09] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89115018.7 | 14.08.1989 | [1990/09] | Priority number, date | JP19880202828 | 15.08.1988 Original published format: JP 20282888 | [1990/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0355658 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0355658 | Date: | 22.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0355658 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C30B31/10, F27D1/00, F27B5/08 | [1990/49] | CPC: |
C23C4/10 (EP,US);
H01L21/30 (KR);
C23C4/11 (EP,US);
C30B31/10 (EP,US);
Y10S261/75 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/09] | C30B31/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1990/09] | Title | German: | Innenrohr für einen Halbleiter-Diffusionsofen | [1990/09] | English: | Semiconductor diffusion furnace inner tube | [1990/09] | French: | Tube interne pour four à diffusion pour les semiconducteurs | [1990/09] | Examination procedure | 04.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 06.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3811829 (WESSON R, et al); | [A]US4761134 (FOSTER BRYAN D [US]); | [A]DE2624756 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]US3868924 (REUSCHEL KONRAD, et al) |