EP0356814 - Method for the preparation of polyether polyols based on aromatic di- and/or polyamines and their use in polyurethane and polyisocyanate synthetic materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/10] | Polyether polyols based on aromatic di- and/or polyamines, method for their preparation and their use in polyurethane and polyisocyanate synthetic materials | ||
[1994/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.11.1995 [1995/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/10] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dietrich, Manfred, Dr. Dresdener Strasse 16 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | 02 /
Kaufung, Reinhard, Dr. c/o Sumitomo Bayer Urethane Co., Ltd. 13-26, 3-chome, Kukuchi Amagasaki, Hyogo Pref. 661 / JP | [1990/10] | Application number, filing date | 89115151.6 | 17.08.1989 | [1990/10] | Priority number, date | DE19883829290 | 30.08.1988 Original published format: DE 3829290 | [1990/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0356814 | Date: | 07.03.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0356814 | Date: | 15.05.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0356814 | Date: | 17.11.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08G65/26, C08G18/50 | [1990/10] | CPC: |
C08G18/4837 (EP,US);
C08G18/4845 (EP,US);
C08G18/5033 (EP,US);
C08G65/2627 (EP,US);
C08G2110/0025 (EP,US);
C08G2110/005 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Polyetherpolyolen auf Basis aromatischer Di- und/oder Polyamine und deren Verwendung für Polyurethan- und Polyisocyanurat-Kunststoffe | [1994/46] | English: | Method for the preparation of polyether polyols based on aromatic di- and/or polyamines and their use in polyurethane and polyisocyanate synthetic materials | [1994/46] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation des polyéther-polyols fondés sur des di- et/ou polyamines aromatiques et leur utilisation pour des materiaux synthétiques en polyuréthane et polyisocyanate | [1994/46] |
Former [1990/10] | Polyetherpolyole auf Basis aromatischer Di- und/oder Polyamine, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und Verwendung für Polyurethan- und Polyisocyanurat-Kunststoffe | ||
Former [1990/10] | Polyether polyols based on aromatic di- and/or polyamines, method for their preparation and their use in polyurethane and polyisocyanate synthetic materials | ||
Former [1990/10] | Polyéther-polyols fondés sur des di- et/ou polyamines aromatiques, procédé pour leur préparation et leur utilisation pour des materiaux synthétiques en polyuréthane et polyisocyanate | Examination procedure | 17.08.1989 | Examination requested [1990/10] | 23.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4614754 (CHRISTMAN DONALD L [US]); | [X]US4243759 (HAAS JAMES L); | [X]EP0239891 (BASF CORP [US]); | [XD]EP0001800 (MOBAY CHEMICAL CORP [US]); | [YP]EP0318748 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 100, no. 12, März 1984 Columbus, Ohio, USA & JP-58134108 (10.08.1983)" Seite 39; ref. no. 86692V |