EP0361079 - Container for sprayable products with a concave bottom and an opening with a detachable closure having a trigger-actuated spraying device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.1995 | Change - applicant | published on 02.11.1995 [1995/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/44] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1990/14] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weltgen, Paul-Otto Tucherweg 11 D-4010 Hilden / DE | [1990/14] | Representative(s) | Meinke, Dabringhaus und Partner GbR Postfach 10 46 45 44046 Dortmund / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/14] | Patentanwälte Meinke, Dabringhaus und Partner Postfach 10 46 45 D-44046 Dortmund / DE | Application number, filing date | 89115538.4 | 23.08.1989 | [1990/14] | Priority number, date | DE19883829962 | 03.09.1988 Original published format: DE 3829962 | [1990/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0361079 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B65D47/34, B65D83/00 | [1990/14] | CPC: |
B05B11/0059 (EP);
B05B15/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/14] | Title | German: | Behälter für sprühfähige Produkte mit nach innen gewölbtem Boden und einer Behälteröffnung mit aufgesetztem Sprühpistolenverschluss | [1990/14] | English: | Container for sprayable products with a concave bottom and an opening with a detachable closure having a trigger-actuated spraying device | [1990/14] | French: | Récipient pour produits destinés à être vaporisés, avec fond concave et ouverture de récipient sur laquelle est montée une fermeture avec pistolet de vaporisation | [1990/14] | File destroyed: | 29.01.1999 | Examination procedure | 05.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/44] | 07.09.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1990/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4220285 (GUALDI PIERO [IT]); | [A]US4671436 (HAGAN RICHARD J [US]); | [A]US4155485 (SPATZ WALTER B [US]); | [A]EP0083687 (BRAMLAGE GMBH [DE]) |