EP0355831 - Purification of glycosaminoglycan degrading enzymes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.1994 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.01.1995 [1995/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEIKAGAKU KOGYO CO., LTD. 1-5, Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/09] | For all designated states SEIKAGAKU KOGYO CO., LTD. 1-5, Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kikuchi, Hiroshi 1417-1, Irumagawa Sayama-shi Saitama / JP | 02 /
Maeyama, Kenichi 504-8, Nobe Akikawa-shi Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Yoshida, Keiichi 14-12, Onta-cho 4-chome Higashimurayama-shi Tokyo / JP | [1990/09] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/09] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr.rer.nat., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89115640.8 | 24.08.1989 | [1990/09] | Priority number, date | JP19880208154 | 24.08.1988 Original published format: JP 20815488 | [1990/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0355831 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0355831 | Date: | 28.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0355831 | Date: | 26.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/14, C12N9/88, C12N9/16 | [1994/04] | CPC: |
C12N9/88 (EP,US);
C12N9/00 (EP,US);
C12N9/16 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/09] | C12N9/00, C12N9/88, C12N9/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1990/09] | Title | German: | Reinigung von Glucosaminoglucan abbauenden Enzymen | [1990/09] | English: | Purification of glycosaminoglycan degrading enzymes | [1990/09] | French: | Purification des enzymes de dégradation du glycosaminoglycane | [1990/09] | Examination procedure | 12.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/02] | 18.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3549500 (SUZUKI SAKARU); | [A]GB1060513 (BIOREX LABORATORIES LTD) | [AD] - CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, vol. 88, 1981, pages 291-303, Elsevier Scientific Publishing Co., Amsterdam, NL; N. OTOTANI et al.: "Purification of heparinase and heparitinase by affinity chromatography on glycosaminoglycan-bound AH-sepharose 4B" |