EP0356976 - Container tear-through closure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.01.1992 [1992/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schmalbach-Lubeca AG Schmalbachstrasse 1 38112 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/10] | For all designated states Schmalbach-Lubeca AG Schmalbachstrasse 1 D-38112 Braunschweig / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Götz, Johannes Martin Kannengiesserstrasse 17 D-3340 Wolfenbüttel / DE | 02 /
Horn, Bernward Wasbüttelerstrasse 2 D-3171 Calberlah / DE | [1990/10] | Representative(s) | Fricke, Joachim, et al Leonhard & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 09 62 80083 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/10] | Fricke, Joachim, Dr., et al Leonhard - Olgemöller - Fricke Patentanwälte Josephspitalstrasse 7 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89115877.6 | 29.08.1989 | [1990/10] | Priority number, date | DE19880010935U | 30.08.1988 Original published format: DE 8810935 U | [1990/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0356976 | Date: | 07.03.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0356976 | Date: | 28.11.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B65D51/22, B65D47/10 | [1990/49] | CPC: |
B65D51/224 (EP);
B65D2251/0018 (EP);
B65D2251/0025 (EP);
B65D2251/0093 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1990/10] | B65D47/10, B65D43/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/10] | Title | German: | Behälter mit Durchtrennverschluss | [1990/10] | English: | Container tear-through closure | [1990/10] | French: | Récipient à fermeture déchirable | [1990/10] | File destroyed: | 12.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 29.05.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/04] | 02.09.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1992/04] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4059201 ; | [A]US4760934 ; | [A]FR1043609 |