EP0358119 - A method for the manufacture of fibreboards [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.11.1993 [1993/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tetra Alfa Holdings S.A. 70, Avenue Général-Guisan 1009 Pully / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1991/26] | For all designated states Tetra Alfa Holdings S.A. 70, Avenue Général-Guisan CH-1009 Pully / CH | ||
Former [1990/20] | For all designated states Tetra Pak Holdings & Finance S.A. 70, Avenue C.-F. Ramuz CH-1009 Pully / CH | ||
Former [1990/18] | For all designated states TETRA PAK HOLDINGS & FINANCE SA 70, Avenue C.-F. Ramuz CH-1009 Pully / CH | ||
Former [1990/11] | For all designated states * / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nilsson, Ingvar Trastvägen 2 S-232 02 Akarp / SE | [1990/11] | Representative(s) | Müller, Hans-Jürgen, et al Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/11] | Müller, Hans-Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Müller, Schupfner & Gauger Postfach 10 11 61 D-80085 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89116156.4 | 01.09.1989 | [1990/11] | Priority number, date | SE19880003095 | 05.09.1988 Original published format: SE 8803095 | [1990/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0358119 | Date: | 14.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0358119 | Date: | 19.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B27N3/02 | [1990/11] | CPC: |
B27N3/02 (EP);
B27N3/007 (EP);
B27N3/06 (EP);
B27N5/00 (EP);
E04C2/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/11] | Title | German: | Methode zur Herstellung von Faserplatten | [1990/11] | English: | A method for the manufacture of fibreboards | [1990/11] | French: | Procédé de production de plaques de fibres | [1990/11] | Examination procedure | 19.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/33] | 17.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1151374 [ ] (HABRA WERK OTT KG, et al); | DE2258169 [ ] (ADOLF SIEBERT FA) |