EP0358176 - Method and device for interrupting a refrigerating circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.12.1990 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.1991 | Request for examination filed | published on 20.02.1991 [1991/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 60596 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/11] | For all designated states Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 D-60596 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Niessen, Wilhelm Birder Strasse 47 D-5135 Selfkant / DE | 02 /
Guderley, Hartmut Rednitzstrasse 40b D-8500 Nürnberg / DE | [1990/11] | Representative(s) | Breiter, Achim Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 60596 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/11] | Breiter, Achim, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 D-60596 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 89116415.4 | 06.09.1989 | [1990/11] | Priority number, date | DE19883830718 | 09.09.1988 Original published format: DE 3830718 | [1990/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0358176 | Date: | 14.03.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0358176 | Date: | 18.07.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F25B45/00 | [1990/11] | CPC: |
F25B45/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, IT, LI, SE [1990/11] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Entsorgung eines Kältemittelkreislaufs | [1990/11] | English: | Method and device for interrupting a refrigerating circuit | [1990/11] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la décharge d'un circuit frigorifique | [1990/11] | File destroyed: | 01.02.1999 | Examination procedure | 17.12.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/06] | 19.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/08] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2226851 ; | [Y]US2614400 ; | [A]US2464563 ; | [A]DE3136608 ; | [A]US4069686 ; | [A]US3548861 ; | [A]US2181854 ; | [A]US2214699 (WOOD ARTHUR W); | [A]US3243969 ; | [A]US3232070 ; | [A]US4285206 |