EP0360078 - Device to operatively remove a piece of tissue from the human or animal body [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.08.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.10.1995 [1995/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Menton, Michael, Dr. Ursrainer Ring 103 D-72076 Tübingen / DE | [1990/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/13] | Representative(s) | Reimold, Otto, et al Patentanwälte Magenbauer, Reimold, Vetter & Abel Plochinger Strasse 109 73730 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/13] | Reimold, Otto, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Magenbauer Dipl.-Phys. Dr. O. Reimold Dipl.-Phys.Dr. H. Vetter Hölderlinweg 58 D-73728 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 89116499.8 | 07.09.1989 | [1990/13] | Priority number, date | DE19883831967 | 21.09.1988 Original published format: DE 3831967 | [1990/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0360078 | Date: | 28.03.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0360078 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61B10/00, A61B17/36 | [1991/24] | CPC: |
A61B18/24 (EP,US);
A61B18/201 (EP,US);
A61B17/42 (EP,US);
A61B90/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/13] | A61B10/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/13] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum operativen Entfernen eines Gewebeteils aus einem menschlichen oder tierischen Körper | [1990/13] | English: | Device to operatively remove a piece of tissue from the human or animal body | [1990/13] | French: | Dispositif pour le prélèvement opératoire d'un échantillon de tissus du corps humain ou animal | [1990/13] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 07.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/01] | 27.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.04.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/42] | 09.05.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1995/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1994 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]DE2309205 (AMERICAN OPTICAL CORP); | [Y]US3345981 (HODGES EARNEST S); | [A]FR2364037 (MALYSHEV BORIS [SU]); | [A]DE3522782 (PETER BREHM CHIR MECHANIK WERK [DE]) |