EP0360225 - Apparatus for applying indicia in accordance with an encrypted message [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/13] | Electronic indicia in bitmapped form | ||
[1995/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.03.1997 [1997/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pitney Bowes Inc. 1 Elmcroft Road, P.O. Box 741 Stamford, CT 06926 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/13] | For all designated states PITNEY BOWES INC. World Headquarters One Elmcroft Stamford CT 06926-0700 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pastor, Jose 191 Wilton Road Westport, CT 06880 / US | [1990/13] | Representative(s) | von Fischern, Bernhard, et al Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/13] | Ritter und Edler von Fischern, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89117311.4 | 19.09.1989 | [1990/13] | Priority number, date | US19880245479 | 19.09.1988 Original published format: US 245479 | [1990/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0360225 | Date: | 28.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0360225 | Date: | 02.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0360225 | Date: | 25.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G07B17/04, G06K1/12, G06K15/10 | [1991/06] | CPC: |
G07B17/00508 (EP,US);
G07B17/00733 (EP,US);
G09C5/00 (EP,US);
G07B2017/0058 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00588 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00758 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00967 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1990/13] | G07B17/04 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1990/13] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Aufbringen von Zeichen gemäss einer verschlüsselten Botschaft | [1995/43] | English: | Apparatus for applying indicia in accordance with an encrypted message | [1995/43] | French: | Dispositif pour appliquer des marques selon un message chiffré | [1995/43] |
Former [1990/13] | Elektronischer Freistempelvermerk im Bitrasterformat | ||
Former [1990/13] | Electronic indicia in bitmapped form | ||
Former [1990/13] | Indice électronique constitué d'une marice de bits | Examination procedure | 02.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/35] | 07.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 23.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 29.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 25.10.1995 | LI | 25.10.1995 | [1997/13] | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]GB2179008 (PITNEY BOWES INC); | [XD]US4660221 (DLUGOS DANIEL F [US]); | [A]US4728783 (BRASS ROBERT L [US], et al); | [A]EP0122165 (LOIRE SEREL ELECTRONIQUE [FR]); | [A]FR2565384 (IMAJE SA [FR]); | [A]FR2603721 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) |