EP0361314 - Guiding catheter with controllable distal tip [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.1997 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.05.1997 [1997/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced Cardiovascular Systems, Inc. P.O. Box 58167 Santa Clara CA 95052 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/14] | For all designated states ADVANCED CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEMS INC 3120 Lakeside Drive P O Box 58167 Santa Clara California 95052-8167 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Badger, Rodney, Seymour 5, Lisa Lane Maraga, CA 94556 / US | 02 /
Wasicek, Lawrence D. 526 E. Evelyn Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | 03 /
Wand, Bruce H. 4193 Mystic Court San Jose, CA 95124 / US | [1990/14] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/14] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89117474.0 | 21.09.1989 | [1990/14] | Priority number, date | US19880250709 | 28.09.1988 Original published format: US 250709 | [1990/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0361314 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0361314 | Date: | 12.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0361314 | Date: | 05.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/092 | [1996/23] | CPC: |
A61M25/0147 (EP,US);
A61M25/0152 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0161 (EP,US);
A61M25/005 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/14] | A61M25/01 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1990/14] | Title | German: | Steuerbarer Katheter mit lenkbarem Distal-Ende | [1990/14] | English: | Guiding catheter with controllable distal tip | [1990/14] | French: | Cathéter dirigeable avec bout distal commandable | [1990/14] | Examination procedure | 07.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 16.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.12.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4586923 (GOULD SHELDON D [US], et al); | [X]US4757827 (BUCHBINDER MAURICE [US], et al); | [YD]US4516972 (SAMSON WILFRED J [US]); | [Y]EP0098100 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]); | [E]DE3819372 ; | [A]DE3039551 (MEDOS KENKYUSHO KK [JP]); | [AD]US4323071 (SIMPSON JOHN B, et al) | Examination | US4582181 |