EP0361525 - Single chip microcomputer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.03.1998 [1998/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/14] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sawase, Terumi 1241-14, Namiyanagi Hanno-shi / JP | 02 /
Hagiwara, Yoshimune 625-8, Nagabusamachi Hachioji-shi / JP | 03 /
Nakamura, Hideo 2196-287, Hirai Hinodemachi Nishitama-gun Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Hatori, Hiroyuki Motoshimanaryo 653, Motoshimanamachi Takasaki-shi / JP | 05 /
Baba, Shirou 5043-39-2-407, Yamaguchi Tokorozawa-shi / JP | 06 /
Akao, Yasushi Neokopo Kokubunji 505, 15-9 Higashikoigakubo-4-chome Kokubunji-shi / JP | [1990/14] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/14] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89118106.7 | 29.09.1989 | [1990/14] | Priority number, date | JP19880244156 | 30.09.1988 Original published format: JP 24415688 | [1990/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0361525 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0361525 | Date: | 13.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0361525 | Date: | 26.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/78 | [1990/14] | CPC: |
G06F9/3879 (EP,US);
G06F7/00 (KR);
G06F11/2236 (EP,US);
G06F15/7814 (EP,US);
G06F15/7867 (EP,US);
G06F9/24 (EP,US);
G06F9/3897 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/14] | Title | German: | Einchipmikrorechner | [1990/14] | English: | Single chip microcomputer | [1990/14] | French: | Microcalculateur sur une puce | [1990/14] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 23.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 02.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0086307 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) | [X] - PROCEEDINGS ICASSP 86, Tokyo, 7th - 11th April 1986, vol. 1, pages 393-396, IEEE, New York, US; S. ABIKO et al.: "Architecture and applications of a 100-NS CMOS VLSI digital signal processor" | [Y] - WESCON TECHNICAL PAPERS, vol. 27, 1983, pages 34/2 1-4; L.L. GOSS: "Single chip microcomputer with EEROM allows flexible system design" | [A] - ELECTRONIQUE INDUSTRIELLE, no. 6, 15th November 1980, pages 43-44, Paris, FR; H. LILEN: "La série 40: une famille de microsystèmes 4 bits en CMOS" | [AP] - MICROPROCESSORS & MICROSYSTEMS, vol. 12, no. 9, November 1988, pages 505-512, Butterworth & Co. (Publishers) Ltd, London, GB; A.C. TEXAS: "TMS320C25 digital signal processor" |