EP0362753 - Clamping device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1994 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schanz, Manfred Talstrasse 4 D-79650 Schopfheim / DE | [1990/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/15] | Representative(s) | Schmitt, Hans, et al Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Dreikönigstrasse 13 79102 Freiburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/15] | Schmitt, Hans, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. H. Schmitt Dipl.-Ing. W. Maucher Dreikönigstrasse 13 D-79102 Freiburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 89118202.4 | 30.09.1989 | [1990/15] | Priority number, date | DE19883833742 | 04.10.1988 Original published format: DE 3833742 | [1990/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0362753 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0362753 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B25B1/02, B25B1/24 | [1990/15] | CPC: |
B25B1/2473 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, IT, LI [1990/15] | Title | German: | Einspannvorrichtung | [1990/15] | English: | Clamping device | [1990/15] | French: | Dispositif de fixation | [1990/15] | Examination procedure | 04.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/27] | 21.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 09.06.1993 | FR | 09.06.1993 | IT | 09.06.1993 | [2008/01] |
Former [2004/35] | ES | 09.06.1993 | |
FR | 09.06.1993 | ||
IT | 09.06.1993 | ||
Former [2002/24] | ES | 09.06.1993 | |
IT | 09.06.1993 | ||
FR | 29.10.1993 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 09.06.1993 | |
FR | 29.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/24] | FR | 29.10.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0052379 (ARNOLD GERHARD); | [Y]DE1301765 (GRESSEL AG AADORF); | [A]DE2227917 (WINKLER ALEXANDER RUDOLF); | [A]US2728251 (WILLIAM TURNER) |