EP0362785 - Continuous speech recognition unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.12.1998 [1998/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/15] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshida, Kazunaga c/o Nec Corporation 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1990/15] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/15] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89118306.3 | 03.10.1989 | [1990/15] | Priority number, date | JP19880250555 | 03.10.1988 Original published format: JP 25055588 | [1990/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0362785 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0362785 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0362785 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G10L5/06 | [1990/15] | CPC: |
G10L15/142 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/15] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Erkennung kontinuierlicher Sprache | [1990/15] | English: | Continuous speech recognition unit | [1990/15] | French: | Dispositif de reconnaissance de la parole continue | [1990/15] | Examination procedure | 26.10.1989 | Examination requested [1990/15] | 19.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 29.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 26.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2579357 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]); | [A]EP0237934 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) | [A] - ICASSP 86, INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING vol. 1, 7 April 1986, TOKYO pages 41 - 44; JUANG & RABINER: 'MIXTURE AUTOREGRESSIVE HIDDEN MARKOV MODELS FOR SPEAKER INDEPENDANT ISOLATED WORD RECOGNITION' | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE vol. 5, no. 2, March 1983, NEW YORK pages 179 - 190; BAHL ET AL.: 'A MAXIMUM LIKELIHOOD APPROACH TO CONTINUOUS SPEECH RECOGNITION' | Examination | EP0237934 | FR2579357 | - EP-A- 0 237 934, & EP0237934 A 00000000 | - FR-A- 2 579 357, & FR2579357 A 00000000 | - March 1983, NEW YORK pages 179 - 190; BAHL ET AL.: 'A MAXIMUM LIKELIHOOD APPROACH TO CONTINUOUS SPEECH RECOGNITION' |