EP0367988 - Diaphragm pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.1993 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.09.1993 [1993/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNF Neuberger GmbH Alter Weg 3 D-79112 Freiburg / DE | [1990/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Becker, Erich Glöcklehofweg 13 D-7812 Bad Krozingen / DE | 02 /
Riedlinger, Heinz Schwarzwaldstrasse 55 D-7812 Bad Krozingen / DE | [1990/20] | Representative(s) | Schmitt, Hans, et al Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Dreikönigstrasse 13 79102 Freiburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/20] | Schmitt, Hans, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. H. Schmitt Dipl.-Ing. W. Maucher Dreikönigstrasse 13 D-79102 Freiburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 89118380.8 | 04.10.1989 | [1990/20] | Priority number, date | DE19883838141 | 10.11.1988 Original published format: DE 3838141 | [1990/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0367988 | Date: | 16.05.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0367988 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F04B39/00, F04B45/04 | [1990/20] | CPC: |
F04B43/0009 (EP,US);
F04B43/009 (EP,US);
F04B43/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1990/20] | Title | German: | Membranpumpe | [1990/20] | English: | Diaphragm pump | [1990/20] | French: | Pompe à membrane | [1990/20] | Examination procedure | 09.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/20] | 07.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.01.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.02.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 31.10.1992 | LI | 31.10.1992 | [1993/38] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]BE349867 ; | [A]US3263618 (CARPENTER KEITH H); | [X]US3877842 (GREENE ROBERT RAYMOND, et al); | [Y]DE2502566 (BECKER ERICH); | [A]US4050861 (SAKAI TOSHIMITSU, et al) |