EP0364868 - Control and shut-off device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.04.1995 [1995/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Preuss, Ute Guttenbrunnenstrasse 26/1 71067 Sindelfingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/17] | For all designated states Preuss, Ute Guttenbrunnenstrasse 26/1 D-71067 Sindelfingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/17] | Representative(s) | Raeck, Wilfrid Moserstrasse 8 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/17] | Raeck, Wilfrid, Dipl.-Ing. Moserstrasse 8 D-70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 89118852.6 | 11.10.1989 | [1990/17] | Priority number, date | DE19883835493 | 18.10.1988 Original published format: DE 3835493 | [1990/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0364868 | Date: | 25.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0364868 | Date: | 04.05.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16K3/04 | [1990/17] | CPC: |
F16K3/04 (EP);
F16K31/1635 (EP);
F16K31/502 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/24] |
Former [1990/17] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Regel- und Absperrvorrichtung | [1990/17] | English: | Control and shut-off device | [1990/17] | French: | Dispositif de commande et d'arrêt | [1990/17] | Examination procedure | 14.11.1989 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) LU | 24.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/52] | 20.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.11.1989 | LU   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3659822 (NAGY JOSEPH G); | [Y]GB2090375 (NAKASHIMA SHIGEO, et al); | [A]FR2523255 (SCHERTLER SIEGFRIED [CH]); | [A]DE3309546 (IDEAL STANDARD [DE]); | [A]US4554943 (CLANEY ROBERT L [US], et al); | [Y]US4587989 (MAYHEW JR JOHN D [US]) |