EP0365935 - Two speed gear train assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.02.1995 [1995/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION Eaton Center Cleveland Ohio 44114 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/18] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION Eaton Center Cleveland, Ohio 44114 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Davis, Alan Richard 649 Marsh Road Plainwell Michigan 49080 / US | [1990/18] | Representative(s) | Rüger, Rudolf, et al Patentanwälte Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Postfach 348 73704 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/18] | Rüger, Rudolf, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Postfach 348 D-73704 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 89119030.8 | 13.10.1989 | [1990/18] | Priority number, date | US19880261955 | 24.10.1988 Original published format: US 261955 | [1990/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0365935 | Date: | 02.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0365935 | Date: | 16.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16H3/08 | [1990/18] | CPC: |
F16H37/043 (EP,US);
F16D11/10 (EP,US);
F16D21/04 (EP,US);
F16D23/0606 (EP,US);
F16D25/088 (EP,US);
F16H3/095 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1990/18] | Title | German: | Zahnradwechselgetriebe mit zwei Gängen | [1990/18] | English: | Two speed gear train assembly | [1990/18] | French: | Dispositif de changement de vitesse à deux rapports | [1990/18] | Examination procedure | 14.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/36] | 27.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0233480 (EATON CORP [US]); | [A]EP0184077 ; | [A]DE2527298 (RUHRKOHLE AG); | [A]CH666098 (OERLIKON BUEHRLE AG); | [A]US4573371 (AKUTAGAWA HITOSHI [JP]) | Examination | - G. Niemann:"Maschinenelemente", Springer-Verlag 1975 |