EP0363988 - Color scanner and automatic setting method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.1997 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.04.1997 [1997/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/16] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morikawa, Seijchiro 798, Miyanodai Kaisei-Machi Ashigara-Kamigun Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Takemoto, Fumito 798, Miyanodai Kaisei-Machi Ashigara-Kamigun Kanagawa / JP | [1990/16] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/16] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89119085.2 | 13.10.1989 | [1990/16] | Priority number, date | JP19880258227 | 13.10.1988 Original published format: JP 25822788 | JP19880258228 | 13.10.1988 Original published format: JP 25822888 | JP19880324424 | 22.12.1988 Original published format: JP 32442488 | JP19880333836 | 28.12.1988 Original published format: JP 33383688 | [1990/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0363988 | Date: | 18.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0363988 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0363988 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/40, G06T1/00, G03B27/73 | [1996/16] | CPC: |
H04N1/40 (EP,US);
Y10S706/90 (US)
|
Former IPC [1991/33] | H04N1/40, G06F15/66, G03B27/73 | ||
Former IPC [1990/16] | H04N1/40 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/16] | Title | German: | Farbabtaster und automatisches Einstellverfahren | [1990/16] | English: | Color scanner and automatic setting method | [1990/16] | French: | Balayeur en couleur et procédé automatique de calage | [1990/16] | Examination procedure | 09.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/19] | 14.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 24.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.1994 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.11.1994 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 29.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP62110366 ; | [A]JP63202738 ; | [AP]JP64000408 ; | [AP]JP2095091 ; | [A]EP0146824 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [YD]GB2182821 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 320 (E-550), 17 October 1987; & JP - A - 62110366 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO. LTD.) 21.05.1987, & JP62110366 A 19871017 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 492 (P-804), 22 December 1988; & JP - A - 63202738 (VICTOR CO. OF JAPAN LTD.) 22.08.1988, & JP63202738 A 19881222 | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 162 (P-859), 19 April 1989; & JP - A - 64000408 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP.) 05.01.1989, & JP64000408 A 19890419 | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 297 (P-945), 27 June 1990; & JP - A - 2095091 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRON CO.) 05.04.1990, & JP2095091 A 19900627 |