EP0367109 - Image-receiving sheet for thermal dye-transfer recording [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.09.1994 [1994/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANZAKI PAPER MFG. CO., LTD. No. 7, Kanda Ogawamachi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [1990/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mukoyoshi, Shunichiro Kanzaki Paper Mfg. Co., Ltd. Kanzaki Works 3-1, Jokoji 4-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo / JP | 02 /
Yamori, Tsunefumi Kanzaki Paper Mfg. Co., Ltd. Kanzaki Works 3-1, Jokoji 4-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo / JP | [1990/19] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/19] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr.rer.nat., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89119909.3 | 26.10.1989 | [1990/19] | Priority number, date | JP19880276748 | 31.10.1988 Original published format: JP 27674888 | JP19890133398 | 26.05.1989 Original published format: JP 13339889 | [1990/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0367109 | Date: | 09.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0367109 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0367109 | Date: | 06.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/00, B41M5/40 | [1991/10] | CPC: |
B41M5/5254 (EP,US);
B41M2205/02 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
Y10S428/914 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31855 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/19] | B41M1/30 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/19] | Title | German: | Bildempfangsschicht für wärmeempfindlichen Farbstoffübertragungsdruck | [1990/19] | English: | Image-receiving sheet for thermal dye-transfer recording | [1990/19] | French: | Feuille réceptrice d'images pour l'enregistrement thermique par transfert de colorant | [1990/19] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 28.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 23.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XPL]JP1113289 ; | [X]JP62103187 ; | [X]JP62275778 | [XPL] - DATABASE WPIL, nØ89-170482, Derwent Publications & JP-A-1113289 (KANZAKI PAPER) 01-05-89, & JP1113289 A 00000000 | [X] - DATABASE WPIL, nØ87-172979, Derwent Publications & JP-A-62103187 (SANYO CHEM) 13-05-87, & JP62103187 A 00000000 | [X] - DATABASE WPIL, nØ88-011740, Derwent Publications & JP-A-62275778 (HITACHI CHEMICAL) 30-11-87, & JP62275778 A 00000000 |